MA S2001 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to drivers license information. Transportation.
Title
Relative to drivers license information
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2017-06-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2017 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S149 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S116 (Similar To) 2018-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1367 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S1718 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S383 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
H358 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H1743 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4679
S116 (Similar To) 2018-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1367 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S1718 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S383 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
H358 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H1743 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4679
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2001 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2001.pdf |