MA S2062 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2560
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish the Metropolitan Transportation Network. Transportation.
Title
Establishing the Metropolitan Transportation Network
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2560 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Accompanied S2560 |
2019-11-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S1197 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2524
H893 (Similar To) 2020-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5012
S683 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S493 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
S2254 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2277 (Similar To) 2020-01-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2560 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H893 (Similar To) 2020-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5012
S683 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S493 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
S2254 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2277 (Similar To) 2020-01-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2560 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2062 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2062.pdf |