MA S2064 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4398
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on October 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 289 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on October 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 289 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regulating notaries public to protect consumers and the validity and effectiveness of recorded instruments
Title
Regulating notaries public to protect consumers and the validity and effectiveness of recorded instruments
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-06 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 289 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2016-09-29 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2016-09-29 | House | Enacted |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House amendment |
2016-07-31 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2016-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-07-25 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-07-25 | House | Amendment adopted (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means), see H4398 |
2016-07-25 | House | Read second |
2016-07-21 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2016-06-13 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2016-06-13 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass, striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of an amendment, H4398 |
2015-11-23 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed - see Roll Call #204 [YEAS 39 - NAYS 0] |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Text of S757, printed as amended |
Same As/Similar To
H4398 (Replaced by) 2016-07-25 - Text of an amendment, see S2064
S2425 (Similar To) 2016-07-14 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S681 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
S2252 (Similar To) 2016-12-12 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2306 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S757 (Similar To) 2015-11-18 - Passed to be engrossed - see Roll Call #204 [YEAS 39 - NAYS 0]
S1756 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2388
S2425 (Similar To) 2016-07-14 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S681 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
S2252 (Similar To) 2016-12-12 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2306 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S757 (Similar To) 2015-11-18 - Passed to be engrossed - see Roll Call #204 [YEAS 39 - NAYS 0]
S1756 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2388
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2064 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2064.pdf |