MA S2131 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a Climate Policy Commission. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Establishing a Climate Policy Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-08 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-06-15 | House | House concurred |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-05-02 | House | House concurred |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 2, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-12-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/14/2021 from 01:30 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H2226 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5197
H275 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4909
S2091 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S2244 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S130 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S490 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S579 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2896
S1601 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2971
H538 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S1186 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1523 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2770
S709 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2928
H275 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4909
S2091 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S2244 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S130 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S490 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S579 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2896
S1601 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2971
H538 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S1186 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1523 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2770
S709 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2928
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2131 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2131.pdf |