MA S2136 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to remove woody biomass from the greenhouse gas emissions standard for municipal lighting plants. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
To remove woody biomass from the greenhouse gas emissions standard for municipal lighting plants
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | House concurred |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Sunday April 7, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-06-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/28/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-06-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/28/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S2095 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2719
H3210 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Reporting date extended to Thursday June 20, 2024, pending concurrence
H3210 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Reporting date extended to Thursday June 20, 2024, pending concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2136 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2136.pdf |