MA S2154 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 23 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-23 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 23 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-23 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act establishing a sick leave bank for Alexis Baez, an employee of the Worcester Recovery Center and Hospital The committee on Ways and Means, to whom was referred the Senate Bill establishing a sick leave bank for Alexis Baez, an employee of the Worcester Recovery Center and Hospital (Senate, No. 2088), reports, recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting a new draft entitled “An Act establishing a sick leave bank for Alexis Baez, an employee of the Department of Mental Health” (Senate, No. 2154).
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Alexis Baez, an employee of the Worcester Recovery Center and Hospital
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-23 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-06-23 | House | Enacted |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2014-06-18 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2014-06-16 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-05-27 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-05-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-05-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2014-05-27 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-05-27 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Substituted as a new draft for S2088 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Recommened new draft for S2088 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Reported from the committee of Senate Ways and Means |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S2154 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S2154.pdf |