MA S2328 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2651
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2651
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2651
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to reimburse for annual training for armed forces members. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Relative to reimbursement for annual training for armed forces members
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2651 |
2023-06-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H48 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4518
S2540 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2610
S2651 (Replaced by) 2024-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2540 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2610
S2651 (Replaced by) 2024-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2328 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2328.pdf |