MA S2356 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Veterans and Federal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Veterans and Federal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase annuity for disabled Veterans and Gold Star families. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Increasing the annuity for disabled Veterans and Gold Star Families
Sponsors
Sen. John Velis [D] | Sen. John Keenan [D] | Rep. Daniel Hunt [D] | Sen. Anne Gobi [D] |
Rep. Steven Xiarhos [R] | Rep. Vanna Howard [D] | Sen. Paul Feeney [D] | Sen. Ryan Fattman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-11-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S2401 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2651
H4164 (Similar To) 2024-02-22 - Amended by substitution of bill, see H4437
S2522 (Similar To) 2024-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4437 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4164 (Similar To) 2024-02-22 - Amended by substitution of bill, see H4437
S2522 (Similar To) 2024-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4437 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2356 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2356.pdf |