MA S2428 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S56
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to creating a loan repayment program for human service workers.. (Senate, No. 2428).
Title
Relative to a loan repayment program for human service workers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-02 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-12-02 | Senate | New draft of S56 |
2019-12-02 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S56 (Replaces) 2019-12-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2428
S2429 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1077 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2429
H163 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4233
H1248 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
H2553 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S2429 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1077 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2429
H163 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4233
H1248 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
H2553 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2428 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2428.pdf |