MA S247 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S249
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-19 - Accompanied S249
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-19 - Accompanied S249
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to high school financial literacy education. Education.
Title
Relative to financial literacy education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-19 | Senate | Accompanied S249 |
2017-06-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S277 (Similar To) 2018-01-19 - Accompanied S249
H2043 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
H222 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
H237 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
H229 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4672
S249 (Replaced by) 2018-03-22 - New draft substituted, see S2343
H2043 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
H222 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
H237 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
H229 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4672
S249 (Replaced by) 2018-03-22 - New draft substituted, see S2343
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S247 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S247.pdf |