MA S2559 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 214 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 214 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the commissioner of capital asset management and maintenance to modify and relocate an easement in the town of West Boylston. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Authorizing the commissioner of capital asset management and maintenance to modify and relocate an easement in the town of West Boylston
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-31 - House - House On Enactment Land Taking Yea and Nay No. 495 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-31 - House - House On Enactment Land Taking Yea and Nay No. 495 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-31 - Senate - Senate Enacted - Roll Call #545 [YEAS 36 to NAYS 0] (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-07-31 - House - House On Enactment Land Taking Yea and Nay No. 495 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-31 - Senate - Senate Enacted - Roll Call #545 [YEAS 36 to NAYS 0] (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-09 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 214 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-07-31 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2018-07-31 | Senate | Enacted - Roll Call #545 [YEAS 36 to NAYS 0] |
2018-07-31 | House | Enacted - 151 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 495) |
2018-07-27 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-07-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-07-27 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-07-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-07-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-07-27 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-07-26 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-07-25 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-07-25 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-07-24 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-07-24 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-07-24 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2018-07-16 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2018-07-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2018 from 01:00 PM-02:00 PM in B-1 |
2018-06-13 | House | House concurred |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
H3015 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H1433 (Similar To) 2018-02-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 5 of the Acts of 2018
S1676 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - New draft substituted, see S2576
S2369 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 212 of the Acts of 2018
H4268 (Similar To) 2018-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 169 of the Acts of 2018
H1433 (Similar To) 2018-02-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 5 of the Acts of 2018
S1676 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - New draft substituted, see S2576
S2369 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 212 of the Acts of 2018
H4268 (Similar To) 2018-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 169 of the Acts of 2018