MA S2566 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2700
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-31 - New draft (O'Connor) substituted, see S2700
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-31 - New draft (O'Connor) substituted, see S2700
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to amend the charter of the Town of Hull to authorize the Chair, Vice-Chair or Clerk of the Town of Hull local licensing authority to issue one day alcohol, common victualler and/or entertainment licenses. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Amending the charter of the Town of Hull to authorize the Chair, Vice-Chair or Clerk of the Town of Hull local licensing authority to issue one day alcohol, common victualler and/or entertainment licenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | Senate | New draft (O'Connor) substituted, see S2700 |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Read third |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-07-25 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-07-16 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2018-06-21 | House | House concurred |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H1097 (Similar To) 2017-09-28 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3930
H259 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
H2865 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
S314 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2428
S1131 (Similar To) 2018-07-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 147 of the Acts of 2018
H4752 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 404 of the Acts of 2018
S2664 (Similar To) 2018-11-26 - New draft substituted, see S2676
H4948 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 341 of the Acts of 2018
H4976 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 409 of the Acts of 2018
S2676 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 355 of the Acts of 2018
S2682 (Similar To) 2018-12-20 - See H4948
S2700 (Replaced by) 2018-12-31 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H259 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
H2865 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
S314 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2428
S1131 (Similar To) 2018-07-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 147 of the Acts of 2018
H4752 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 404 of the Acts of 2018
S2664 (Similar To) 2018-11-26 - New draft substituted, see S2676
H4948 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 341 of the Acts of 2018
H4976 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 409 of the Acts of 2018
S2676 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 355 of the Acts of 2018
S2682 (Similar To) 2018-12-20 - See H4948
S2700 (Replaced by) 2018-12-31 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2566 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2566.pdf |