MA S2759 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S147
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to support MassMakers, reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2759).
Title
To support MassMakers
Sponsors
House Committee on Community Development and Small Business | Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D] | Rep. Adam Scanlon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-03-17 | Senate | New draft of S147 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Community Development and Small Businesses |
Same As/Similar To
S147 (Replaces) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2759
S974 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S399 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
S92 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2649
S358 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2883
H3254 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S974 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S399 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
S92 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2649
S358 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2883
H3254 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2759 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2759.pdf |