MA S2832 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on July 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish the Massachusetts Works Progress Administration. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
To establish the Massachusetts Works Progress Administration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-25 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2020-07-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 08/07/2020 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Accepting Written Testimony |
2020-07-20 | House | House concurred |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-07-13 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2832 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2832.pdf |