MA S301 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2538
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish farm to school grants to promote healthy eating and strengthen the agricultural economy. Education.
Title
Establishing farm to school grants to promote healthy eating and strengthen the agricultural economy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2538 |
2019-05-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/03/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S731 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S272 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H557 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H524 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H437 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4426
S261 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S1113 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2711
S306 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S307 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S314 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S330 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H2351 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3853 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
S2538 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S272 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H557 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H524 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H437 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4426
S261 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S1113 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2711
S306 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S307 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S314 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S330 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H2351 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3853 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
S2538 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S301 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S301.pdf |