MA S325 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2615
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2615
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2615
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the screening of prospective school employees for prior investigations into child abuse or sexual misconduct. Education.
Title
Relative to the screening of prospective school employees for prior investigations into child abuse or sexual misconduct
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2615 |
2023-11-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S2615 (Replaced by) 2024-02-12 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1585 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - House concurred
H1604 (Similar To) 2023-03-28 - Hearing scheduled for 04/04/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S1585 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - House concurred
H1604 (Similar To) 2023-03-28 - Hearing scheduled for 04/04/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S325 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S325.pdf |