MA S437 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Election Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Election Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to early voting cost reimbursements. Election Laws.
Title
Relative to early voting cost reimbursements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | House | House concurred |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Tuesday May 28, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-05-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/17/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
S441 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2655
H718 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
H718 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S437 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S437.pdf |