MA S536 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to boater safety to be known as the David Hanson Act. Environment and Natural Resources.
Title
Relative to boater safety to be known as the David Hanson Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2023-09-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/11/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources |
Same As/Similar To
H3362 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4489
H4489 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4489 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S536 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S536.pdf |