MA S587 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2399
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-30 - New draft substituted, see S2399
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-30 - New draft substituted, see S2399
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create a statutory housing restriction and providing remedies related to statutory housing. Housing.
Title
Relative to creating a statutory housing restriction and providing remedies related to statutory housing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-30 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2399 |
2012-07-30 | Senate | Read second |
2012-07-30 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-07-30 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2399 |
2012-01-26 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2011-10-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/03/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
S2399 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S587 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=8279&generalCourtId=1 |