MA S595 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2636
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2636
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2636
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to strengthen the control of contagious and infectious diseases in the Commonwealth. Financial Services.
Title
To strengthen the control of contagious and infectious diseases in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2636 |
2023-04-28 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 05/02/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-04-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A2 and virtual |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S1624 (Similar To) 2024-03-18 - Accompanied H2528
S2636 (Replaced by) 2024-02-15 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2636 (Replaced by) 2024-02-15 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S595 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S595.pdf |