MA S728 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to make a technical changes to the Betsy Lehman Center for Patient Safety and Medical Error Reduction enabling statute. Health Care Financing.
Title
Making technical changes to the Betsy Lehman Center for patient safety and medical error reduction enabling statute
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-03-28 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 1, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-06-05 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 06/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-06-02 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-06-02 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-05-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H1165 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S728 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S728.pdf |