MA S755 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H1195
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Accompanied H1195
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Accompanied H1195
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to clarify rate setting processes for home health and home care services. Health Care Financing.
Title
Clarifying rate setting processes for home health and home care services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | Accompanied H1195 |
2023-07-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2023 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S1788 (Similar To) 2023-05-11 - Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2023 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
H4412 (Similar To) 2024-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1195 (Replaced by) 2024-04-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4412 (Similar To) 2024-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1195 (Replaced by) 2024-04-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S755 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S755.pdf |