MA S779 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-03 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-03 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase access to MassHealth dental providers. Health Care Financing.
Title
Increasing access to MassHealth dental providers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S367 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1236 (Similar To) 2023-10-03 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H4433 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1236 (Similar To) 2023-10-03 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H4433 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S779 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S779.pdf |