MA S881 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to create the Massachusetts healthy homes program. Housing.
Title
Creating the Massachusetts healthy homes program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2023-09-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/27/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H4060 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4518
S2496 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2496 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S881 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S881.pdf |