MD HB1002 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting the Commissioner of Correction from prohibiting an inmate placed in restrictive housing from having access to a transitional coordinator or case manager within 180 days before the direct release of the inmate from a correctional facility to the community.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Direct Release

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-08SenateFavorable with Amendments {658971/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-08SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-04-04SenateRereferred to Judicial Proceedings
2019-04-01SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2019-03-29HouseThird Reading Passed (131-0)
2019-03-28HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-28HouseFavorable with Amendments {152416/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-28HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-02-11HouseHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback