MD HB1002 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 49
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 49
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange to open a special or other enrollment period for an individual who consents to share information through a certain system; requiring the Maryland Department of Labor to begin implementing a system, by September 1, 2021, through which an individual who has filed a claim for benefits may consent to the sharing of relevant information by the Department with the Exchange and the Maryland Department of Health to determine whether the individual qualifies for free or low-cost insurance; etc.
Title
Unemployment - Insurance Revisions and Special Enrollment Period for Health Benefits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 49 |
2021-03-30 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2021-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed (100-34) |
2021-03-30 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {133223/1 Adopted |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2021-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (95-40) |
2021-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-11 | House | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Ghrist) Adopted |
2021-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {283892/1 Adopted |
2021-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2021-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-05 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Claims
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Contractors
Contracts
County Executives
COVID-19
Data
Demographics
Disabilities
Disclosure
Emergencies
Emergency Bills
Fraud
Health Benefit Exchange
Health Insurance
Health, Department of
Industry and Technology
Insurance
Interest
internet
Job Training
Labor, Department of
Language
Mobile Devices
Notices
pandemics
Penalties and Sentences
Public Information
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Time
Unemployment
Unemployment Insurance
Work, Labor, and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Contractors
Contracts
County Executives
COVID-19
Data
Demographics
Disabilities
Disclosure
Emergencies
Emergency Bills
Fraud
Health Benefit Exchange
Health Insurance
Health, Department of
Industry and Technology
Insurance
Interest
internet
Job Training
Labor, Department of
Language
Mobile Devices
Notices
pandemics
Penalties and Sentences
Public Information
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Time
Unemployment
Unemployment Insurance
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Insurance | 31 | 108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 8 | 109 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 8 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 8 | 809 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |