MD HB1010 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 248
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 248
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governing body of Prince George's County to enter into an agreement with an owner of real property who is engaged in constructing or operating housing structures or projects for the payment of a negotiated amount in lieu of county property taxes on the property; requiring property that is subject to a payment in lieu of taxes agreement to be used for a housing structure or project that is acquired, constructed, or rehabilitated under certain programs or acquired under a Right of First Refusal program; etc.
Title
Prince George's County - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Low-Income Housing PG 415-21
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 248 |
2021-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-1) |
2021-04-08 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {779039/1 Adopted |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2021-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-03-05 | House | Hearing 3/16 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-05 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Community Facilities and Services
Housing
Leases and Rent
Poverty
Prince George's County
Property Tax
Taxes - Property - Local
Housing
Leases and Rent
Poverty
Prince George's County
Property Tax
Taxes - Property - Local
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 7 | 506.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |