MD HB102 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a person subject to regulation as a mortgage loan originator from making a payment, threat, or promise for the purpose of influencing another person to violate specified federal or State law or professional standards in connection with a mortgage loan or loan application; prohibiting a specified person from making a payment, threat, or promise to an appraiser of residential real estate in order to influence the independent judgment of the appraiser, and from engaging in specified other acts and practices; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Financial Institutions - Mortgage Loan Originators - Prohibited Acts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-12 Approved by the Governor
2011-04-02 Third Reading Passed (46-0)
2011-04-01 Second Reading Passed
2011-04-01 Favorable Report Adopted
2011-04-04 Favorable Report by Finance
2011-03-16 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2011-03-02 First Reading Finance
2011-04-03 Returned Passed
2011-03-01 Third Reading Passed (139-1)
2011-02-25 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2011-02-24 Special Order until 2/25 (Delegate McDonough) Adopted
2011-02-23 Special Order until 2/24 (Delegate McDonough) Adopted
2011-02-23 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2011-02-22 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2011-02-02 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
2011-01-24 First Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback