MD HB1020 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 143
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 143
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the distribution of local impact grants provided from proceeds of video lottery terminals in Baltimore City; specifying that a portion of specified grants be distributed in a manner consistent with adopted neighborhood priorities; specifying that a portion of the grants to a neighborhood in the Northwest Community Planning Forum Strategic Neighborhood Action Plan be distributed in a manner that is consistent with that plan's priorities; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact Grants
Sponsors
Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D] | Sen. Jill Carter [D] | Del. Frank Conaway [D] | Sen. Nathaniel Oaks [D] |
Sen. Barbara Robinson [D] | Del. Shawn Tarrant [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 143 |
2013-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2013-03-25 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2013-03-23 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments {415666/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2013-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Gaming
Grants
Hearings
Licenses
Lottery
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Officials
Revenue and Taxes
Urban Renewal
Gaming
Grants
Hearings
Licenses
Lottery
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Officials
Revenue and Taxes
Urban Renewal