MD HB1023 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-11 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-11 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing to 500 feet the distance that liquor stores in the 45th Legislative District in Baltimore City are required to be from places of worship or schools; and applying the Act prospectively.
Title
Baltimore City - 45th Legislative District - Liquor Stores - Premises Near
Sponsors
Del. Curtis Anderson [D] | Del. Frank Conaway [D] | Del. Cheryl Glenn [D] | Del. Hattie Harrison [D] |
Del. Keith Haynes [D] | Del. Brian McHale [D] | Sen. Barbara Robinson [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 110 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-11 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-04-11 | Hearing 4/11 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-04-09 | Re-referred Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-04-03 | First Reading Senate Rules | |
2011-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (110-26) | |
2011-03-31 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-31 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-02-14 | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-11 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Churches
Private Schools
Public Schools
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Churches
Private Schools
Public Schools