MD HB1045 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the number of commemorative registration plates that the Motor Vehicle Administration may issue at any one time; requiring the Administration to issue specially designed registration plates to enhance awareness of the importance of native plants and wildflowers to the Chesapeake Bay; requiring the Administration to transfer a portion of the additional registration fee charged for commemorative plates issued under the Act to the Chesapeake Bay Trust for specified purposes; etc.
Title
The Maryland Native Plants and Wildflower Preservation Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-14 | Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn | |
2012-03-09 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-13 | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-10 | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Agriculture
Chesapeake Bay
Conservation
Fees
License Plates
Motor Vehicle Administration
Revenue and Taxes
Chesapeake Bay
Conservation
Fees
License Plates
Motor Vehicle Administration
Revenue and Taxes
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/HB1045.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/hb/hb1045f.pdf |