MD HB1045 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 391
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 391
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of the Environment, on or before January 1, 2019, to propose regulations that encourage the use of permeable micro- or ultra-filtration membrane bioreactor (MBR) or other treatment technologies in on-site sewage disposal systems for nonresidential uses; and requiring specified regulations proposed by the Department to update specified evaluation criteria and increase a specified hydraulic loading rate that may be considered for a specified nonresidential system.
Title
On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Membrane Bioreactor (MBR) Technology - Regulations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 391 |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2017-04-06 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {894434/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2017-03-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-07 | House | Special Order until 3/08 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted |
2017-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {480911/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-02-24 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |