MD HB1047 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a limitation on the number of Sunday off-sale permits that the Board of License Commissioners for Prince George's County may issue.
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Off-Sale Permits PG 314-20
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-20 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-06 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Blue Laws
Commerce and Business
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Prince George's County
Retail Sales
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Blue Laws
Commerce and Business
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Prince George's County
Retail Sales
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 26 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 26 | 1104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1047?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb1047f.pdf |