MD HB105 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-10 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-3)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-10 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-3)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the penalty for the possession or use of drug paraphernalia involving the use or possession of less than 10 grams of marijuana; making the use or possession of drug paraphernalia under specified circumstances a civil offense; establishing that a person who violates specified provisions of the Act may be issued a specified citation; prohibiting a person from smoking marijuana in specified areas; providing penalties for smoking marijuana in specified areas; etc.
Title
Criminal Law - Drug Paraphernalia and Marijuana - Penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-3) (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Kagan01) {263328/1 Rejected (3-41) (Y: 3 N: 41 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Feldman) {843326/1 Rejected (22-24) (Y: 22 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (90-48) (Y: 90 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Shoemaker01) {603822/1 Rejected (59-78) (Y: 59 N: 78 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Kagan01) {263328/1 Rejected (3-41) (Y: 3 N: 41 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Feldman) {843326/1 Rejected (22-24) (Y: 22 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (90-48) (Y: 90 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Shoemaker01) {603822/1 Rejected (59-78) (Y: 59 N: 78 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-3) |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Kagan) {263328/1 Rejected (3-41) |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Feldman) {843326/1 Rejected (22-24) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {438279/1 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (90-48) |
2015-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-19 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Shoemaker) {603822/1 Rejected (59-78) |
2015-03-19 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Carozza) {853528/2 Adopted |
2015-03-18 | House | Special Order until 3/19 (Delegate Anderson) Adopted |
2015-03-17 | House | Special Order until 3/18 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted |
2015-03-17 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2015-02-24 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-23 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Citations
Civil Actions
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
District Courts
Education
Fines
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Law Enforcement
Minors
Motor Vehicles
Parking
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Public Buildings and Facilities
Shopping Centers
Smoking
Substance Abuse
Summonses
Trials
Witnesses
Civil Actions
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
District Courts
Education
Fines
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Law Enforcement
Minors
Motor Vehicles
Parking
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Public Buildings and Facilities
Shopping Centers
Smoking
Substance Abuse
Summonses
Trials
Witnesses