MD HB1059 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 541
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 541
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing, in Allegany County and Garrett County, gift basket permits; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Allegany County to issue a gift basket permit to certain persons; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Garrett County to issue a gift basket permit to certain persons; prohibiting each of the Boards from issuing the permit for certain uses; providing that the permit authorizes a permit holder to sell and deliver gift baskets containing beer, wine, or liquor to certain individuals; etc.
Title
Allegany and Garrett Counties - Alcoholic Beverages - Gift Basket Permits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 541 |
2021-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2021-03-12 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-05 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2021-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-05 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB731 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 542
Subjects
Age of Majority
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Allegany County
Boundaries
Delivery Services
Evidence
Fees
Garrett County
Gifts
License Commissioners, Boards of
Records
Reports
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Weights and Measures
Work, Labor, and Employment
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Allegany County
Boundaries
Delivery Services
Evidence
Fees
Garrett County
Gifts
License Commissioners, Boards of
Records
Reports
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Weights and Measures
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 21 | 1001.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 21 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 9 | 1001.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 9 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |