MD HB1062 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a hospital, under specified circumstances, to provide specified notice to a patient of the patient's outpatient status and the billing implications of the outpatient status; and requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, in consultation with specified hospitals, to adopt by regulation standardized elements to be included in a specified written notice.
Title
Hospitals - Notice to Patients - Outpatient Status and Billing Implications
Sponsors
Del. Bonnie Cullison [D] | Del. Robert Costa [R] | Del. Donald Elliott [R] | Del. Wade Kach [R] |
Sen. Ariana Kelly [D] | Del. Susan Krebs [R] | Sen. Nathaniel Oaks [D] | Del. Kirill Reznik [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (126-0) (Y: 126 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203 |
2013-04-06 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2013-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (126-0) |
2013-04-06 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {127773/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2013-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2013-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {756189/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2013-02-28 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-15 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2013-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Hospitals
Notices
Patients
Prices
Rules and Regulations
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Hospitals
Notices
Patients
Prices
Rules and Regulations