MD HB1062 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stating a specified finding of the General Assembly; requiring the Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners to provide specified information to specified residents and community leaders; requiring the Board to provide an opportunity to specified individuals to coordinate specified efforts with a specified design team; requiring a specified committee to provide an opportunity to specified individuals to communicate specified efforts to a specified committee; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - 10-Year Plan for Public School Facilities - Neighborhood Revitalization and Community Development
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn |
2014-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-03 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-03-04 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-06 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Committees and Commissions
Community Development
Economic and Community Development
Education - Local Bills
Public Information
Committees and Commissions
Community Development
Economic and Community Development
Education - Local Bills
Public Information