MD HB1064 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-07 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-07 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Applying the sales and use tax to a sale or use of certain home amenity rentals; and authorizing a county or municipality to impose a certain home amenity rental tax under certain circumstances and subject to certain limitations.
Title
Home Amenity Rentals - Sales and Use Tax Imposed and Local Tax Authorized
Sponsors
Del. Joe Vogel [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 91 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - Floor Amendment 873620/1 (Delegate Fisher) Rejected (Y: 38 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-04-06 - House - Floor Amendment 873620/1 (Delegate Fisher) Rejected (Y: 38 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-07 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2023-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (91-44) |
2023-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-04-06 | House | Floor Amendment {873620/1 (Delegate Fisher) Rejected (38-98) |
2023-04-05 | House | Motion Special Order until 4/6 (Delegate Atterbeary) Adopted |
2023-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {833228/1 Adopted |
2023-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2023-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-10 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB691 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 805
Subjects
Calvert County
Carroll County
Cecil County
Chartered Counties
Code Counties
Counties
Garrett County
Hearings
Leases and Rent
Municipal Corporations
News Media
Open Government
Rules and Regulations
Sales and Use Tax
Somerset County
St. Mary's County
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local
Taxes - Sales and Use
Washington County
Carroll County
Cecil County
Chartered Counties
Code Counties
Counties
Garrett County
Hearings
Leases and Rent
Municipal Corporations
News Media
Open Government
Rules and Regulations
Sales and Use Tax
Somerset County
St. Mary's County
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local
Taxes - Sales and Use
Washington County
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Local Government | 20 | 901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 20 | 902 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 20 | 903 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 20 | 904 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 20 | 905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 20 | 906 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 20 | 907 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 20 | 908 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 20 | 909 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 20 | 910 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 20 | 911 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 11 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |