MD HB1066 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1253
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-18 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-18 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing certain members of a volunteer fire company to equip their privately owned vehicles with red and white lights or signal devices.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Lighting - Privately Owned Vehicles of Volunteer Fire Company Members
Sponsors
Del. Dana Stein [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2022-03-15 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-14 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-10 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB1066 (Carry Over) 2022-03-18 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Fire Protection
Laws and Ordinances
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Operation
Transportation - Generally
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Volunteers
Laws and Ordinances
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Operation
Transportation - Generally
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Volunteers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 22 | 218 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |