MD HB1070 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a definition to exclude the sale of poultry or rabbit products at a farmer's market from regulation as a food service facility; clarifying that a license is not required to deliver prepackaged food products; providing that a license is not required for sales of a poultry product or a rabbit product if the farm on which the product was raised is not subject to specified federal regulation; prohibiting a local jurisdiction from requiring a license for the sale of specified poultry and rabbit products; etc.
Title
Farmer's Markets - Sale of Poultry and Rabbits
Sponsors
Del. Wendell Beitzel [R] | Del. Jeannie Haddaway-Riccio [D] | Del. James Hubbard [D] | Del. Tom Hucker [D] |
Del. Jolene Ivey [D] | Del. Charles Jenkins [R] | Sen. Christopher Shank [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-16 | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn | |
2010-03-15 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-02-24 | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-17 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/HB1070.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/hb/hb1070f.pdf |