MD HB1072 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting, under specified circumstances, an employer from failing or refusing to hire, discharging, or otherwise discriminating against an applicant or employee on the basis of the applicant's or employee's engagement in a lawful activity off the employer's premises during nonworking hours; authorizing an applicant or employee aggrieved by a violation of the Act to file a civil action against the employer to obtain specified relief; providing for a specified limitations period for filing an action under the Act; etc.
Title
Labor and Employment - Discrimination Based on Engagement in Lawful Activities - Prohibition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-20 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2015-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:30 p.m. |
2015-03-03 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-27 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Attorneys' Fees
Civil Actions
Counties
Court Costs
Courts
Discrimination
Municipal Corporations
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Public Employees
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Statutes of Limitation
Work, Labor and Employment
Attorneys' Fees
Civil Actions
Counties
Court Costs
Courts
Discrimination
Municipal Corporations
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Public Employees
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Statutes of Limitation
Work, Labor and Employment