MD HB1073 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 645
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 645
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Montgomery County Board of License Commissioners to fulfill a specified notice requirement by posting online a completed application for an alcoholic beverages license at least 14 days before the hearing date.
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Applications - Online Notice MC 5-16
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 645 |
2016-04-11 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2016-03-09 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-09 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-08 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2016-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Electronic Government
Forms
Hearings
License Commissioners, Boards of
Montgomery County
Notices
Public Information
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Electronic Government
Forms
Hearings
License Commissioners, Boards of
Montgomery County
Notices
Public Information