MD HB1076 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a credit grantor that makes a specified installment loan to a consumer borrower to require the consumer borrower to pay a balloon payment at maturity of the installment loan if the amount of the installment loan exceeds $30,000 and the installment loan is secured by a lien on a motor vehicle.
Title
Credit Regulation - Installment Loans Secured by Motor Vehicle Lien - Balloon
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-05 | Third Reading Passed (44-1) | |
2010-04-04 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-04 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2010-03-31 | Hearing 4/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-26 | First Reading Finance | |
2010-04-03 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-24 | Third Reading Passed (141-0) | |
2010-03-23 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-25 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2010-02-18 | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-17 | First Reading Economic Matters |