MD HB108 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the membership of the State Amusement Ride Safety Advisory Board to remove one consumer member and add one representative of amusement ride rental operators; and requiring that the race and gender composition of the Board reflect the composition of the population of the State.
Title
Business Regulation - State Amusement Ride Safety Advisory Board - Membership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-01 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2011-03-16 | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-07 | First Reading Finance | |
2011-03-31 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-04 | Third Reading Passed (123-14) | |
2011-03-02 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-02 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-01 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-01-24 | Hearing 2/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-24 | First Reading Economic Matters |