MD HB1088 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-7)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 640
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-7)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 640
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a pharmacy for which a pharmacy permit has been issued by the State Board of Pharmacy and a sterile compounding facility to provide to an ophthalmologist for office use, without a patient-specific prescription, specified compound drugs for specified purposes; requiring sterile compounding facility to require the ophthalmologist to provide to the sterile compounding facility the identity of any patient to whom the drugs are administered; etc.
Title
Health Occupations - Compound Drugs - Provision to Ophthalmologists for Office Use
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-0) (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 640 |
2014-04-05 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-0) |
2014-04-05 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {374339/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2014-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {286180/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-02-27 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-06 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Disclosure
Emergency Medical Services
Federal Government
Health Occupations
Ophthalmologists
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Reports
Storage
Disclosure
Emergency Medical Services
Federal Government
Health Occupations
Ophthalmologists
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Reports
Storage