MD HB11 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax in the amount of $3,500 for qualifying members of the Maryland Defense Force; providing that an individual may not qualify for the subtraction modification based on membership in the Maryland Defense Force unless the Maryland Defense Force maintains specified records and provides specified reports; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2011.
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Maryland Defense Force
Sponsors
Del. Jon Cardin [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-01 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2011-03-29 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-25 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | |
2011-03-31 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-25 | Third Reading Passed (135-2) | |
2011-03-24 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-24 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-25 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | |
2011-01-26 | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-12 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2010-11-19 | Pre-filed |