MD HB1100 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 594
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 594
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing funding for, the award of, and the distribution of bonuses for child care providers and employees; and requiring, in fiscal year 2023, the Governor to include in the annual budget an appropriation of $16,000,000 to the State Department of Education to carry out the Act.
Title
Child Care Providers and Employees - Bonuses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 108 N: 24 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 105 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 108 N: 24 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 105 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 594 |
2022-04-11 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Conference Committee Report {833222/1 Adopted |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator King) Adopted |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Conference Committee Report {833222/1 |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (108-24) |
2022-04-11 | House | Conference Committee Report {833222/1 Adopted |
2022-04-09 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators King, Guzzone and Edwards) |
2022-04-09 | House | Senate Refuses Recede |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators King, Guzzone and Edwards) |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Senate Refuses Recede |
2022-04-09 | Senate | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Ebersole, C. Branch and Wilkins) |
2022-04-09 | Senate | House Requests Senate Recede |
2022-04-09 | Senate | House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments |
2022-04-08 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Ebersole, C. Branch and Wilkins) |
2022-04-08 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2022-04-08 | House | House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {193024/1 Adopted |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (105-34) |
2022-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {753423/1 Adopted |
2022-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2022-02-25 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) |
2022-02-25 | House | Hearing canceled (Ways and Means) |
2022-02-16 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 12:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) |
2022-02-10 | House | First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB806 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-08 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Appropriations
Awards, Medals, and Prizes
Budgets
Child Care
Children
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Sunset
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Awards, Medals, and Prizes
Budgets
Child Care
Children
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Sunset
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment