MD HB1105 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 4 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 4 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an individual, subject to certain exceptions, to be certified as an advanced practice registered nurse before practicing advanced practice registered nursing in the State.
Title
Advanced Practice Registered Nurses - Certification Requirement and Exceptions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2024-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2024-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-13 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-02-13 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Health
Health Occupations
Medical Schools
Nurses
Rules and Regulations
Students
Committees and Commissions
Health
Health Occupations
Medical Schools
Nurses
Rules and Regulations
Students
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 8 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |