MD HB1107 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 774
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 774
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a specified procurement officer to make a specified determination before a primary procurement unit is authorized to take specified action regarding an intergovernmental cooperative purchasing agreement; requiring a primary procurement unit to post specified determinations on the primary procurement unit's Web site; requiring an intergovernmental cooperative purchasing agreement to be approved by a specified unit head and subject to specified other approval under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Procurement - Intergovernmental Cooperative Purchasing Agreements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 774 |
2017-04-10 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (141-0) |
2017-04-10 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {644135/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2017-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {396886/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2017-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Contracts
Electronic Government
Notices
Procurement
State Government - Procurement
Contracts
Electronic Government
Notices
Procurement
State Government - Procurement