MD HB1115 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering certain hours of sale, certain square footage requirements, and a certain license fee for the holder of a public market license in the 46th alcoholic beverages district in Baltimore City; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City to waive certain distance restrictions for an application for the transfer of a license into a certain area; prohibiting the Board from charging a holder of an alcoholic beverages license a certain fee if the holder holds a Temporary Outdoor Seating Permit; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses and Outdoor Table Service Privileges
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2022-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-0) |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-0) |
2022-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {973024/1 Adopted |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2022-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-11 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB771 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Emergency Bills
Fees
Jurisdiction
License Commissioners, Boards of
Retail Sales
Time
Zoning and Planning
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Emergency Bills
Fees
Jurisdiction
License Commissioners, Boards of
Retail Sales
Time
Zoning and Planning
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 12 | 1002.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 12 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 12 | 1604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 12 | 1605 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 12 | 2204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |